Cairns, Bonnie Jean (CPSO#: 60651)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Jones Street
Oakville ON  L6L 6C5
Phone: (905) 827-9865
Fax: (905) 827-3583
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BONNIE JEAN CAIRNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIRNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1991