Cairns, Pamela Anne (CPSO#: 70650)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1998
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1998