Cairns, Patricia Davidson (CPSO#: 56736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 6
Lower Level
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone: (416) 485-9155
Fax: (416) 485-9532
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mehta Cairns Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mehta ( CPSO# 56838 )
Dr. P. Cairns ( CPSO# 56736 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4244

Business Address:
Suite 6
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2
Phone Number: (416) 485-9155

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA DAVIDSON CAIRNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIRNS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1987