Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cait, Ted Alan (CPSO#: 59532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 Rossland Road East
Suite 308
Ajax ON  L1Z 0M1
Phone: (905) 427-0597
Fax: (905) 427-3710
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Kenneth Hobbs avenue
Whitby ON  L1R 0G6
Canada
Phone: (905) 665-6200
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TED ALAN CAIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAIT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1989