Caldarone, Christopher Anthony (CPSO#: 70608)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 08 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Columbia University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiovascular Surgery
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue Room 1525
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6420
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Iowa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 08 Jul 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY CALDARONE may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DEPARTMENT OF SURGERY, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. CALDARONE holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. CALDARONE may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. CALDARONE no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. CALDARONE no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. CALDARONE no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 May 2006