Caldwell, Forrest Harvey (CPSO#: 33474)

Current Status: Expired: Member deceased as of 27 Jan 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. F. H. Caldwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Caldwell ( CPSO# 33474 )

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
Powell Building
110 - 50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1982
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 27 Jan 2018