Califaretti, Nadia Federica Bruna (CPSO#: 66584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer
Centre
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5262
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadia Califaretti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Califaretti ( CPSO# 66584 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADIA FEDERICA BRUNA CALIFARETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALIFARETTI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1997