Callaghan, James Gabriel Joseph (CPSO#: 106573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2009 Long Lake Road
Suite 205
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone: (705) 586-3601
Fax: (705) 586-3602
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James G. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Callaghan ( CPSO# 106573)

Business Address:
205 - 2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 6C3
Phone Number: (705) 586-3601

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 30 May 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES GABRIEL JOSEPH CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2017