Callaghan, Siobhan Marie (CPSO#: 67874)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Langs CHC
1145 Concession Road
Cambridge ON  N3H 4L5
Phone: (519) 653-1470
Fax: (519) 653-6277
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

128 Emerald St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Phone: 905-526-7137
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SIOBHAN MARIE CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 19 Aug 1996 to 13 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996