Callaghan, Wayne Dean (CPSO#: 59490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1096 Goyeau Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1J1
Phone: (519) 977-5364
Fax: (519) 977-5651
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. D. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Callaghan ( CPSO# 59490 )
Dr. M. Lin ( CPSO# 61051 )

Business Address:
1096 Goyeau Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1J1
Phone Number: (519) 977-5364

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAYNE DEAN CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989