Callaghan, William Bryan (CPSO#: 25792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
139 Greenbank Road
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone: (613) 721-6463
Fax: (613) 721-9899
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. Bryan Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Callaghan ( CPSO# 25792 )

Business Address:
200 - 139 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 9A5
Phone Number: (613) 721-6463

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM BRYAN CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1979