Callahan, Justine Elise (CPSO#: 82487)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
535 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0V1
Phone: (613) 746-5350
Fax: (613) 746-5340
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUSTINE ELISE CALLAHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008