Callary, Eva Maria (CPSO#: 50812)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Bichlmeier-Callary, Eva Maria (used until: 27 Nov 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Rhenish Frederick William Univ of Bonn, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012