Callum, Jeannie Louise (CPSO#: 66911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Rm B2-04
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4757
Fax: (416) 480-6035
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeannie L. Callum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Callum ( CPSO# 66911 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Rm B-204
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANNIE LOUISE CALLUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLUM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1998