Calonego, Kathleen Vera (CPSO#: 100955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Port Arthur Clinic
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7757
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathleen Calonego Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Calonego ( CPSO# 100955)

Business Address:
The Port Arthur Clinic
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN VERA CALONEGO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALONEGO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015