Caloyannis, Brenda Claire (CPSO#: 33747)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Caloyannis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2011

Medical Records Location

Address:  Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Box 35 Sheguiandah, Ontario P0P 1W0
Date Received: 02 Jun 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011