Calpin, Caroline (CPSO#: 62108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Westway Children's Clinic
Unit 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone: (416) 244-7617
Fax: (416) 244-0310
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Calpin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Calpin ( CPSO# 62108 )

Business Address:
The Westway Children's Clinic
Unit 4
1723 Kipling Avenue
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2Y8
Phone Number: (416) 244-7617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE CALPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALPIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991