Caluseriu, Oana (CPSO#: 84448)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 07 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Institute Medicine,Pharmacy,Tirgu-Mures, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 23 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2007 to 01 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2009 to 30 Apr 2009
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2010 to 07 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2010