Calvert, Chrystella Katherine (CPSO#: 55375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
109 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 628-9200
Fax: (905) 628-9600
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRYSTELLA KATHERINE CALVERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALVERT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2012