Calvin, James Eldon (CPSO#: 28613)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-3892
Fax: (519) 663-8619
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James E. Calvin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Calvin ( CPSO# 28613 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3892

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ELDON CALVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALVIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2013