Calvo Ballesteros, Maria Eugenia (CPSO#: 87427)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Anaesthesia
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75171
Electoral District: 04

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 05 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 06 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014