Calzonetti, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 62574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: Doull, Elizabeth Anne (used until: 09 Jun 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone: (905) 975-4347
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E. Calzonetti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Calzonetti ( CPSO# 62574 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 975-4347

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 May 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE CALZONETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALZONETTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 May 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1992