Camazzola, Daniele Carlo (CPSO#: 70212)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3Y1
Phone: (905) 883-4443
Fax: (905) 883-4477
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniele Camazzola Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Camazzola ( CPSO# 70212 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
22 Richmond Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3Y1
Phone Number: (905) 883-4443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELE CARLO CAMAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMAZZOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Dec 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1999