Cambridge, Mary Jeanette (CPSO#: 63783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: Kaye, Mary Jeanette (used until: 09 Jul 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201C
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 326-2208
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cambridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cambridge ( CPSO# 63783 )
Dr. R. Cambridge ( CPSO# 65098 )

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
201C - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-2208

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JEANETTE CAMBRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMBRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1992