Cambridge, Robert Malcolm (CPSO#: 65098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cambridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Cambridge ( CPSO# 63783 )
Dr. R. Cambridge ( CPSO# 65098 )

Business Address:
201C - 119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-2208

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM CAMBRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMBRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1993