Cameron, Colin John (CPSO#: 61816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Russian, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Lawrence Valley Correctional and
Treatment Centre
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Phone: (613) 341-2870 Ext. 1331
Fax: (613) 341-2884
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colin Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cameron ( CPSO# 61816 )

Business Address:
St. Lawrence Valley Correctional and
Treatment Centre
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville ON  K6V 5T1
Phone Number: (613) 341-2870

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990