Cameron, Daniel John (CPSO#: 62625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 501
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 725-3117
Fax: (613) 725-3237
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matzinger and Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matzinger ( CPSO# 33282 )
Dr. D. Cameron ( CPSO# 62625 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
501 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOHN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991