Cameron, Donald William (CPSO#: 60117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus - Box 228
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8923
Fax: (613) 737-8925
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DW Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cameron ( CPSO# 60117 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8923

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 05 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD WILLIAM CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1997