Cameron, Hugh Charles (CPSO#: 16639)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1958
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1995

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Jan 1994
Summary:

 In June 1993, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cameron guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 26(28) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he committed sexual 
 impropriety with a patient.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cameron be reprimanded, 
 with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be 
 suspended for a period of three months.  The Committee further ruled that a condition be placed on 
 Dr. Cameron's licence, such that he be required to continue to receive treatment from a 
 psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar, at intervals and for such a period as deemed appropriate 
 by the treating psychiatrist and the Registrar.  Dr. Cameron(s licence was also to be subject to 
 the further condition that he permit the treating psychiatrist to submit reports to the Registrar 
 at six-month intervals, indicating Dr. Cameron's compliance with the requirement that he continue 
 to receive treatment.  This treating psychiatrist was to be in a position to provide assurance to 
 the Registrar that Dr. Cameron's condition was such that the public was safe from any breaches of 
 the physician-patient fiduciary relationship.  The Committee stipulated that failure to comply 
 with any of the conditions set out in the penalty would result in the immediate revocation of Dr. 
 Cameron's licence.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Sep 08, 1992