Cameron, Hugh Urquhart (CPSO#: 26228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
43 Wellesley Street East
Suite 318
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone: (416) 967-8734
Fax: (416) 975-2679
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh U. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 4 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH URQUHART CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1973