Cameron, James Douglas (CPSO#: 31788)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994