Cameron, John Charles Sherwood (CPSO#: 23844)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016