Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cameron, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 67759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
New Vision FHT
421 Greenbrook Drive Unit 23 B
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone: (519) 578-3510
Fax: (519) 578-6040
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Cameron ( CPSO# 67759 )

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3

Business Address:
New Vision FHT
23B
421 Greenbrook Drive
Kitchener ON  N2M 4K1
Phone Number: (519) 578-3510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1996