Cameron, Kristjana Gene (CPSO#: 88314)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Dec 2011
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 2011