Cameron, Reid Sutherland (CPSO#: 70443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hornepayne Community Hospital
P O Box 190
Hornepayne ON  P0M 1Z0
Phone: (807) 868-2442
Fax: (807) 868-3145
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reid Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 70443 )

Business Address:
Hornepayne Community Hospital
278 Front Street
P.O. Box 190
Hornepayne ON  P0M 1Z0
Phone Number: (807) 868-2442

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REID SUTHERLAND CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998