Cameron, Robert Stewart (CPSO#: 30026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3211 Sandwich St
Windsor ON  N9C 1A9
Phone: (519) 946-0208
Fax: (519) 946-0209
Electoral District: 01

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 19 Dec 2011
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 19 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2013
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 29 Jun 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Cameron’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Cameron is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his care of patients.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., June 29, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron:

            Prescribing and dispensing

            (I)   Dr. Cameron shall not issue new prescriptions, renew or authorize the
                  renewal of existing prescriptions, authorize the refill of existing
                  prescriptions or dispense or administer any of the following substances:

                  a.    Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  b.    Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  
                  c.    Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  
                  d.    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Appendix "1"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Appendix "2")
                  
                  e.    All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Appendix
                        "3");
                  
                  and as amended from time to time. 
                  
            (ii)  Dr. Cameron shall return any supplies of the substances referred to in
                  section (i) above that are presently in his possession, in any place, to
                  a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in the College's
                  Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iii) Dr. Cameron shall inform the College of each and every location where he
                  practises including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and
                  office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice Location(s)"),
                  within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he shall inform the
                  College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of
                  commencing practice at that location.


            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (iv)  Dr. Cameron shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all
                  of his Practice Locations in the form set out at Appendix "4".  For
                  further clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 

                                    IMPORTANT NOTICE
                  
                  Dr. Cameron must not prescribe any of the following: 
                  
                        -     Narcotic Drugs
                        -     Narcotic Preparations
                        -     Controlled Drugs
                        -     Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
                        -     All other Monitored Drugs
                  
                  Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                  Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
            (v)   Dr. Cameron shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the signs described above, in his waiting
                  room(s) and each of his examination and/or consulting rooms, in all of
                  his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location;

            (vi)  Dr. Cameron shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (v)
                  above within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Monitoring

            (vii) Dr. Cameron shall consent to the College making appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan, the Drug Program Service Branch, the
                  Narcotic Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and
                  Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may have
                  relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr. Cameron's
                  compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign such
                  consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information from
                  these persons or institutions; and

            (viii)Dr. Cameron shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Cameron's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jan 2013
Summary:

On January 14, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron 
committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or 
omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Dr. 
Cameron admitted the allegation.  
 
Between 2008 and 2010, Dr. Cameron worked with Ms AB, a Registered Practical Nurse, and 
made unwanted and inappropriate remarks of a sexual nature, including stories of sexual 
interactions with his girlfriend. Around February 2010, while Ms AB was working, Dr. Cameron 
put his arm around her hip and waist, with his hand resting on the upper part her left buttock. Ms 
AB ultimately reported the matter to the police.   
 
Commencing in August 2009, Ms CD, a Registered Practical Nurse, worked with Dr. Cameron. 
Dr. Cameron made unwanted, inappropriate and unprofessional comments of a personal nature 
regarding his ex-wife and his girlfriend and spoke unprofessionally regarding Ms CD to the 
father of a young patient. In early 2010, Dr. Cameron raised his voice at Ms CD in an irate 
fashion where patients were present.  
 
In or about January 2010, in a conversation with Ms AB, Dr. Cameron made threatening remarks 
with respect to Dr. EF. Ms AB reported to Dr. EF and the police that Dr. Cameron stated he 
would like to meet EF in a dark alley with a baseball bat. 
 
On March 3, 2010, Dr. Cameron was charged with sexual assault with respect to Ms AB and 
uttering threats with respect to Dr. EF. On June 18, 2010, the charges were withdrawn on the 
condition that Dr. Cameron enter into a peace bond for a one-year period. The conditions of the 
bond included not communicating with Ms AB and Dr. EF and not to be within a 50-metre radius 
of the Hospital.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
      the Registrar suspend Dr. Cameron's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) 
      months, to commence January 31, 2013 at 11:59 p.m.;  
 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Cameron's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      a)    Dr. Cameron shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete a 
            one-to-one course in boundary issues and communications approved by the 
            College;    
 
      Dr. Cameron attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and 
 
      Dr. Cameron shall pay the College its costs in the amount of $3,650.00 within six months 
      of the date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 14, 2013


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Dec 2011
Summary:

 On December 5, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Robert Stewart Cameron committed an 
 act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice 
 of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members 
 as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Dr. Cameron failed to see, assess, treat or 
 respond to a two yearold boy while the boy was in the clinic and suffering from a life threatening 
 anaphylactic reaction. Dr. Cameron was aware that the child was in the clinic, and yet did not 
 leave his office at any time to attend to the child or to assist the paramedic while a medical 
 emergency was occurring in the immediate vicinity. Fortunately for the child, the paramedic was 
 immediately available and arrived and provided lifesaving measures within minutes of the 
 receptionist placing the ambulance call.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed 
 that:

1.	The Registrar suspend Dr. Cameron's certificate of registration for a period of one (1) 
 month, to commence December 19, 2011; 

2.	The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions 
 and limitations on Dr. Cameron's certificate of registration: 

a)	Dr. Cameron shall, at his own 
 expense, participate in and successfully complete a onetoone educational program in medical ethics 
 specifically tailored to the allegations in the Notice of Hearing organized and approved by the 
 College; 

3.	Dr. Cameron attend before the panel to be reprimanded; and

4.	Dr. Cameron shall 
 within 160 days pay the College its costs in the amount of $7,300.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 4 and 5, 2011, December 5, 2011