Cameron, Roderick Hugh (CPSO#: 50334)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
X Ray Associates
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 102
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: 289 553 6336
Fax: 289 553 6339
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health Centre
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 2009
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

B02 - 250 Harding Blvd
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: 905 737 0594
Fax: 905 737 7538
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2216
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3
Canada
Phone: (905) 751-1500
Fax: (905) 751-1505
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )

Business Address:
X-Ray Associates
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 12 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RODERICK HUGH CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1985