Cameron, Ross Graeme (CPSO#: 45145)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 22 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1986
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005