Campanaro, Roberto Miguel (CPSO#: 62682)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: Rouget, Roberto Miguel (used until: 13 Sep 1999 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Western Hospital
148 Poplar Street, Alberton, PE
Alberton PE  C0B 1B0
Phone: (902) 853-8650
Fax: (902) 853-8658
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roberto Campanaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Prince Edward Island

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERTO MIGUEL CAMPANARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPANARO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991