Campbell, Aaron Roy (CPSO#: 73668)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart Street
Victory 3
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6802
Fax: (613) 548-7884
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kingston Orthopaedic and Pain Inst.
797 Princess Street
Suite 500
Kingston ON  K7L 1G1
Canada
Phone: (613) 344-1202
Fax: (613) 344-1203
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Lennox & Addington County
General Hospital
8 Richmond Park Dr.
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Canada
Phone: (613) 354-3301
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.R. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Campbell ( CPSO# 73668 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Lennox & Addington Hospital
8 Richmond Park Drive
Napanee ON  K7R 2Z4
Phone Number: (613) 354-3301

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Victory 3
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON ROY CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004