Campbell, Alexander Bruce Hector (CPSO#: 42797)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1985
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Apr 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993