Campbell, Andrew Iain Macleod (CPSO#: 66766)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2004