Campbell, Cailin Maura (CPSO#: 95095)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 Upper Sherman Ave
Hamilton ON  L8V 3M7
Phone: (905) 546-2800
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAILIN MAURA CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2013