Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Campbell, Carolyn Norma Jean (CPSO#: 59360)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carolyn N. J. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 8 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 835 King Street Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Date Received: 28 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015