Campbell, Craig Gordon Norman (CPSO#: 70014)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Western Ontario
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8332
Fax: (519) 685-8350
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Craig GN Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell ( CPSO# 70014 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of University of Western Ontar
800 Commissioners Road East
Suite B1-777
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 06 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG GORDON NORMAN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000