Campbell, Fiona Anne (CPSO#: 54230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 May 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7451
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fiona Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Campbell ( CPSO# 54230 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 May 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 May 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 May 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2009 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Fiona Anne Campbell may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  clinical  teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the
                        Department of Anaesthesia,  University  of  Toronto,  in  which Dr.
                        Campbell  holds  a  geographical  full-time  teaching  or  research
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements  of
                        her appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  will  automatically  expire  when Dr.
                  Campbell no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.