Campbell, James Allan (CPSO#: 64841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Feb 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Feb 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 325-4936
Fax: (705) 325-7574
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James A. Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell ( CPSO# 64841 )

Business Address:
202 - 16 O'Brien Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 325-4936

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALLAN CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1992