Campbell, James Daniel (CPSO#: 50338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2216
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Dan Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Campbell ( CPSO# 50338 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DANIEL CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987