Campbell, James (CPSO#: 50337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Commissioners Walk-In Clinic
Suite 111
1 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z3
Phone: (519) 668-2400
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jun 1982 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2001