Campbell, Neena Marlene Ruby (CPSO#: 53346)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 19 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Campbell-Soper, Neena Marlene Ruby (used until: 12 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Mar 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1983
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Jul 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jul 2001
Summary:

 On July 19, 2001, the Discipline accepted Dr. Campbell(s plea of guilty and found her guilty of 
 professional misconduct in that the governing body of a health profession in a jurisdiction other 
 than Ontario has found that Dr. Campbell committed an act of professional misconduct that would, 
 in the opinion of a panel of the Discipline Committee, be an act of professional misconduct as 
 defined in the regulations. Dr. Campbell was found by a discipline panel in Quebec to have engaged 
 in sexual impropriety with a patient. The Discipline Committee ordered that Dr. Campbell(s 
 certificate of registration be revoked and a recorded reprimand.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 19, 2001